+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 22, 2016 in the Council:
- Law L21-0093 Effective from Mar 23, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 5921, Expires on Nov 3, 2016
On February 3, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On January 29, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0277 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 993
On January 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0277
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0277
- Returned from Mayor
On January 8, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 25, 2016
On January 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
- Retained by the Council
On December 15, 2015 in the Council:
- First Reading
- B21-0537 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
January 5, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
December 15, 2015: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor