+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 11, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0506 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14401
On December 8, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0506
On November 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 07, 2020
On November 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On October 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On October 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0535
On July 29, 2020 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0535
On July 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 6, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On December 6, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0535 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Health
- B23-0535 Introduced by Councilmembers Todd, R. White, Bonds, Nadeau, T. White, Evans, Cheh, Allen, Gray, and Grosso at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
November 10, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Absent
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
October 20, 2020: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor