+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 25, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0225 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 16245, Expires on Mar 16, 2016
On December 18, 2015 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0225, Expires on Mar 16, 2016
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0225, Expires on Mar 16, 2016
On December 8, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 22, 2015
On December 1, 2015 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- Retained by the Council
On November 25, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0500 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 1, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor