+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 1674, Expires on May 10, 2017
On February 10, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On February 9, 2017 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0001, Expires on May 10, 2017
- Signed with Act Number A22-0001, Expires on May 10, 2017
On February 2, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 16, 2017
On January 10, 2017 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
- Final Reading CC
On January 3, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0005 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
January 10, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor