+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 27, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0149 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10734, Expires on Jan 16, 2018
On October 19, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On October 18, 2017 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0149, Expires on Jan 16, 2018
- Signed with Act Number A22-0149, Expires on Jan 16, 2018
On October 17, 2017 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On October 4, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 19, 2017
On October 3, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0498 Introduced by Councilmember Allen at Office of the Secretary
- Final Reading
+ − Vote
October 3, 2017: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor