+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Act A24-0208 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 012193, Expires on Feb 06, 2022
On November 9, 2021 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 8, 2021 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0208, Expires on Feb 06, 2022
On November 5, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 22, 2021
On November 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On October 27, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0491 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 2, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor