+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 1, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A23-0131 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14298, Expires on Jan 21, 2020
On October 24, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On October 23, 2019 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0131, Expires on Jan 21, 2020
On October 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On October 10, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 25, 2019
On October 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- B23-0485 Introduced by Councilmembers Allen, Silverman, Gray, R. White, Nadeau, Cheh, Evans, and Grosso at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 8, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor