+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 26, 2018 in the Council:
- Law L22-0039 Effective from Jan 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 556, Expires on Aug
On December 1, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0185 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12302
- Transmitted to Congress
On November 27, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 22, 2017 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0185
- Signed with Act Number A22-0185
On November 13, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 28, 2017
On November 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On October 6, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0474 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 3, 2017 in the Council:
- First Reading
- Retained by the Council
On September 26, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0474 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
November 7, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
October 3, 2017: First Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor