+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 27, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0201 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 15274, Expires on Feb 21, 2016
On November 23, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0201, Expires on Feb 21, 2016
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0201, Expires on Feb 21, 2016
- Returned from Mayor
On November 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On November 9, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 24, 2015
On November 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- B21-0470 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 3, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor