+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A22-0617 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 1656
On January 31, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On January 30, 2019 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0617
- Signed with Act Number A22-0617
On January 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 30, 2019
On December 18, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On December 4, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On November 29, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 28, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0459
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0459
On December 12, 2017 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0459
On October 20, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 13, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 29, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0459 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 19, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0459 Introduced by Councilmembers Gray, Cheh, Bonds, T. White, Grosso, R. White, McDuffie, Evans,
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety and Committee on Health
+ − Votes (2)
December 18, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
December 4, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2