+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 22, 2018 in the Council:
- Law L22-0105 Effective from Jun 5, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 6780
On April 23, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On April 13, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0306 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3784
On April 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On April 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0306
- Signed with Act Number A22-0306
On March 23, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Apr 6, 2018
On March 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On February 6, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On January 17, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0431
- Committee Report Filed
On December 11, 2017 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0431
On December 8, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 24, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 22, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0431 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 19, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On September 18, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0431 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
February 6, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor