+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 6, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0187 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 14222, Expires on Jan 25, 2016
On October 28, 2015 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On October 27, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0187, Expires on Jan 25, 2016
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0187, Expires on Jan 25, 2016
On October 20, 2015 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On October 14, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 28, 2015
On October 6, 2015 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- B21-0430 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 6, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor