+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A23-0129 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14808, Expires on Jan 20, 2020
On October 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0129, Expires on Jan 20, 2020
- Legislative Meeting
On October 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On October 4, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On October 1, 2019 in the Council:
- Vetoed by the Mayor
On September 20, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 04, 2019
On September 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- B23-0427 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
October 22, 2019: Override of Mayoral Veto
- Yeas: 13
September 17, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor