+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 8, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0417
On July 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0417 View Public Hearing Record
On June 17, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 14, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 8, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0417 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 5, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On October 1, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0417 Introduced by Councilmembers T. White, Henderson, Nadeau, Lewis George, Pinto, McDuffie, and Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
November 1, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
October 18, 2022: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes