+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 8, 2020 in the Council:
- Law Number L23-0153 Effective from Dec 08, 2020
On October 23, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
- Act A23-0419 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12259
On October 15, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On October 14, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0419
On September 29, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 14, 2020
On September 22, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On July 21, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On July 15, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0402
On October 28, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0402 View Public Hearing Record
On October 11, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Human Services
On July 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0402 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 9, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0402 Introduced by Councilmembers Nadeau, Todd, Cheh, Allen, Grosso, R. White, Bonds, T. White, Evans, Silverman, Gray, McDuffie, and Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
September 22, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
July 21, 2020: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor