+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On September 19, 2017 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On August 4, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0108 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7392, Expires on Oct 23, 2017
On July 26, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 25, 2017 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0108, Expires on Oct 23, 2017
- Signed with Act Number A22-0108, Expires on Oct 23, 2017
On July 13, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 27, 2017
On July 11, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0390 Introduced by Councilmembers Allen, Nadeau, Evans, Cheh, Todd, McDuffie, Gray, T. White,
- Final Reading
+ − Vote
July 11, 2017: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor