+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Amendment (Cheh)
On November 15, 2016 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On November 9, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 7, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0386
On September 23, 2016 in the Council:
- Re-Referral published
On September 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On December 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0386
On November 27, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 2, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0386 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 22, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment and Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
On September 21, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0386 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (3)
December 6, 2016: Amendment (Cheh)
- Yeas: 13
December 6, 2016: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
November 15, 2016: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor