+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On September 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On August 2, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A23-0100 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9732, Expires on Oct 22, 2019
On July 26, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 24, 2019 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0100, Expires on Oct 22, 2019
On July 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 29, 2019
On July 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On July 8, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0376 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 9, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor