+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 11, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0131 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7775, Expires on Oct 29, 2017
On August 1, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 31, 2017 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0131, Expires on Oct 29, 2017
- Signed with Act Number A22-0131, Expires on Oct 29, 2017
On July 19, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 2, 2017
On July 11, 2017 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On June 27, 2017 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On June 22, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0356 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 11, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor