+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 13, 2021 in the Council:
- Act A24-0157 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008012, Expires on Nov 03, 2021
On August 6, 2021 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On August 5, 2021 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0157, Expires on Nov 03, 2021
On July 23, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 06, 2021
On July 13, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council
On July 12, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0350 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson, and Councilmember Nadeau at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 13, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor