+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Act A20-0161 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 14720, Expires on Dec 28, 2013
On October 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On September 30, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0161, Expires on Dec 28, 2013
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0161, Expires on Dec 28, 2013
On September 25, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 9, 2013
On September 17, 2013 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
On June 26, 2013 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On June 17, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0349 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
September 17, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor