+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 2, 2016 in the Council:
- Law L21-0152 Effective from Aug 20, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 11143
On July 11, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Aug 20, 2016
On July 8, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0447 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9323
On July 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 30, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0447
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0447
On June 16, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 30, 2016
On June 7, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Amendment (Mendelson)
On June 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On May 3, 2016 in the Council:
- Motion to Postpone to 6/7/16
On March 1, 2016 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0341
On November 19, 2015 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0341
On October 9, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 25, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0341 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 22, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On September 16, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0341 Introduced by Councilmember Allen at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (4)
June 7, 2016: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 13
June 7, 2016: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
May 3, 2016: Motion to Postpone to 6/7/16
- Yeas: 13
March 1, 2016: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor