+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Law L20-0025 Effective from Oct 17, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 15318, Expires on May 30, 2014
On August 2, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Oct 17, 2013
- Act A20-0118 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 11115
On July 25, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 24, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0118
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0118
On July 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 29, 2013
On July 10, 2013 in the Council:
- Final Reading
On June 26, 2013 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On June 18, 2013 in the Council:
- 1st Reading
On June 17, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0339 Introduced by Councilmembers Barry and Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
July 10, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2013: 1st Reading
- Yeas: 13