+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Law L22-0069 Effective from Mar 30, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4779
On January 3, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On December 29, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0217 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13440
On December 21, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 20, 2017 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0217
- Signed with Act Number A22-0217
On December 11, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 26, 2017
On December 5, 2017 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On November 27, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0336
- First Reading CC
On September 20, 2017 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0336
On August 11, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 27, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On June 23, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0336 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 20, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0336 Introduced by Councilmember Allen at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 5, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 7, 2017: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor