+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Apr 9, 2019
On November 23, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0515 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12951
On November 13, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0515
- Signed with Act Number A22-0515
On October 29, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 13, 2018
On October 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On October 2, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On September 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On September 20, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0329
On September 21, 2017 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0329
On September 1, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 23, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0329 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 20, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0329 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh and Allen at Committee of the Whole
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
+ − Votes (2)
October 16, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
October 2, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor