+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 10, 2018 in the Council:
- Law L22-0144 Effective from Jul 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8187
On June 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On June 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0371 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5980
On May 22, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0371
- Signed with Act Number A22-0371
On May 7, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018
On May 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On April 30, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 6, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On February 20, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0328
On February 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0328
On January 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 23, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0328 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 20, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On June 15, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0328 Introduced by Councilmember Allen at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
March 6, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor