+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 11, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0084 Effective from Feb 22, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3739
On January 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0254 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 178
On January 9, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Feb 22, 2014
On December 30, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 27, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0254
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0254
On December 16, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 31, 2013
On December 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Final Reading
On November 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute (Catania) - accepted as friendly
- First Reading
On October 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 2, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0311
On July 9, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0311
On July 2, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0311
On June 14, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0311 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- B20-0311 Introduced by Councilmember Catania at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (3)
December 3, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 5, 2013: Amendment in the nature of a substitute (Catania) - accepted as friendly
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
November 5, 2013: First Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor