+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On September 20, 2019 in the Council:
- Re-Referral published.
On September 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On May 28, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
On May 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0299 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 13, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0299 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso, and Nadeau at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor