+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0080 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6223, Expires on Sep 26, 2017
On June 29, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 28, 2017 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A22-0080, Expires on Sep 26, 2017
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0080, Expires on Sep 26, 2017
On June 15, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 29, 2017
On June 6, 2017 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
- Retained by the Council
On May 26, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0299 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 6, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor