+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Act A20-0096 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 9847, Expires on Sep 25, 2013
On June 27, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0096, Expires on Sep 25, 2013
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0096, Expires on Sep 25, 2013
- Returned from Mayor
On June 21, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 8, 2013
On June 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
On June 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On May 30, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0296 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 18, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor