+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Law L21-0074 Effective from Feb 27, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 3937
On January 8, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
- Act A21-0250 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 252
On December 29, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0250
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0250
- Returned from Mayor
On December 14, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 29, 2015
On December 1, 2015 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On November 3, 2015 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On October 29, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 28, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0295
On October 1, 2015 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0295
On August 21, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0295 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 14, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On July 8, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0295 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 1, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
November 3, 2015: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor