+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 13, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0470 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13254
On November 5, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 18, 2020
On November 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 2, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0470
On October 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 03, 2020
On September 22, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On September 21, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On July 21, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0289
On January 22, 2020 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0289
On December 27, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 10, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0289 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 7, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
- B23-0289 Introduced by Councilmembers T. White, R. White, Grosso, and Bonds at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
September 22, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
July 21, 2020: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes