+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 31, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0128 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 10339, Expires on Oct 25, 2015
On July 27, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0128, Expires on Oct 25, 2015
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0128, Expires on Oct 25, 2015
- Returned from Mayor
On July 13, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 27, 2015
On June 30, 2015 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- Retained by the Council
On June 25, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0286 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 30, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor