+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 31, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0120 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 10186, Expires on Oct 20, 2015
On July 23, 2015 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 22, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0120, Expires on Oct 20, 2015
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0120, Expires on Oct 20, 2015
On July 9, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 23, 2015
On June 30, 2015 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- Retained by the Council
On June 25, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0277 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 30, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor