+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Law L22-0061 Effective from Feb 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2631
On January 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0222 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 127
On January 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On December 29, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 28, 2017 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A22-0222
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0222
On December 13, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 28, 2017
On December 5, 2017 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On November 7, 2017 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On October 12, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 5, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0027
On April 12, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On April 11, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0027
On April 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Re-Referral published
On April 4, 2017 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to Committee on Health
On March 23, 2017 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0027
On March 3, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 24, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 13, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0027 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 10, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- B22-0027 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso, Allen, Gray, T. White, Nadeau, Evans, Cheh, Silverman,
+ − Votes (2)
December 5, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 7, 2017: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor