+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 6, 2021 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On August 5, 2021 in the Council:
- Vetoed by the Mayor
On July 23, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 06, 2021
On July 13, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On July 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0264 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 29, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On June 1, 2021 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On May 28, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0264 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson, Councilmembers R. White, and McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
June 29, 2021: Amendment (Allen)
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
June 29, 2021: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor