+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0077 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6217, Expires on Sep 26, 2017
On June 29, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 28, 2017 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0077, Expires on Sep 26, 2017
- Signed with Act Number A22-0077, Expires on Sep 26, 2017
On June 15, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 29, 2017
On June 6, 2017 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On May 2, 2017 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On April 27, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0264 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 6, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor