+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0246 View Public Hearing Record
On November 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 15, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On May 21, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0246 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 18, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities, Committee on Recreation, Libraries, and Youth Affairs, and Committee of the Whole with comments from the Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On May 12, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0246 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor