+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 25, 2016 in the Council:
- Law L21-0082 Effective from Mar 9, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 4287
On January 22, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0264 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 772
On January 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On January 12, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0264
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0264
- Returned from Mayor
On December 28, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 12, 2016
On December 15, 2015 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On December 1, 2015 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On November 20, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On November 19, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0241
On October 30, 2015 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0241
On September 11, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 16, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
On June 12, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0241 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 3, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0241 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh and Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 15, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
December 1, 2015: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor