+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 29, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 13, 2021
On December 1, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 25, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0234
On January 16, 2020 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0234 View Public Hearing Record
On December 27, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0234 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 2, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
- B23-0234 Introduced by Councilmembers McDuffie, Nadeau, Bonds, Silverman, Gray, Grosso, R. White, Allen, T. White, Evans, and Cheh at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
December 1, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
November 17, 2020: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor