+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On September 23, 2016 in the Council:
- Re-Referral published
On September 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to sequentially to the Committee on Finance and Revenue, Committee on Judiciary, Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Local Business Development and Utilities, and Committee on Committee of the Whole
On February 9, 2015 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0023
On January 23, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 20, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs, Committee on Finance and Revenue, Committee on Judiciary, and Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0023 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 6, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0023 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso, Orange, Evans, and Nadeau at Office of the Secretary