+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 26, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A23-0047 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5301, Expires on Jul 14, 2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On April 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On April 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0047, Expires on Jul 14, 2019
On April 4, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Apr 19, 2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On April 1, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0229 Introduced by Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 2, 2019: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor