+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On December 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 29, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0228
On November 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 25, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0228
On October 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On September 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0228
On July 12, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On July 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0228
On June 15, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On May 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0228 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 4, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On April 29, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0228 Introduced by Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 6, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
December 6, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor