+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On August 27, 2021 in the Council:
- Law L24-0019, Effective from Jul 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008601, Expires on Mar 11, 2022
On June 15, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On June 11, 2021 in the Council:
- Act A24-0095 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006023
On June 8, 2021 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0095
On May 25, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 09, 2021
On May 18, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On May 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0218 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 4, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council
On May 3, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0218 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
May 4, 2021: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor