+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 11, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On September 27, 2019 in the Council:
- Law L23-0016, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12631
On July 30, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On July 26, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A23-0092 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8621
On July 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0092
On July 10, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 24, 2019
On June 18, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On May 14, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0209
On April 26, 2019 in the Council:
- Oversight Hearing on B23-0209 View Oversight Hearing Record
On April 2, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 29, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Oversight Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0209 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 20, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0209 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (20)
June 18, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Mendelson #1)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Mendelson and McDuffie)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Mendelson #3)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Mendelson #4)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Allen)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Grosso)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Bonds)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Silverman #1)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Silverman #2), as orally amended by CM Cheh
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Silverman #3)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Gray #1)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Gray and McDuffie) - not considered
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Gray #4)
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 11
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Gray #5)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 9
June 18, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Motion to Reconsider (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 13
June 18, 2019: Amendment (Mendelson #5)
- Yeas: 13
May 14, 2019: First Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor