+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 29, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0073 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 6884, Expires on Aug 24, 2015
On May 26, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0073, Expires on Aug 24, 2015
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0073, Expires on Aug 24, 2015
- Returned from Mayor
On May 12, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 27, 2015
On May 5, 2015 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Oral amendment (Cheh)
- Oral amendment (Mendelson)
- Amendment (Silverman)
- Amendment (Mendelson)
- Retained by the Council
On May 1, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0185 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (5)
May 5, 2015: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 11
May 5, 2015: Amendment (Silverman)
- Yeas: 11
May 5, 2015: Oral amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 11
May 5, 2015: Oral amendment (Cheh)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
May 5, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor