+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 10, 2018 in the Council:
- Law L22-0140 Effective from Jul 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8183
On June 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On June 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0367 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5970
On May 22, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A22-0367
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0367
On May 11, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018
On May 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On April 10, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On April 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 20, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0185
On November 28, 2017 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0185
On October 20, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 21, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0185 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 9, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0185 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
April 10, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor