+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0051 Effective from Dec 13, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 573
On November 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Act A20-0190 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 15155
On October 24, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 13, 2013
On October 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On October 17, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0190
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0190
On October 7, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 22, 2013
On October 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Final Reading
On July 10, 2013 in the Council:
- 1st Reading
On July 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On July 2, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0177
On June 6, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0177
On May 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0177 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- B20-0177 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh and Wells at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
October 1, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
July 10, 2013: 1st Reading
- Yeas: 13