+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 23, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0548
On December 8, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 22, 2020
On November 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 6, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0150
On February 18, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On February 11, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0150
On October 21, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0150
On October 4, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 12, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0150 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Education, and Committee of the Whole
- B23-0150 Introduced by Councilmembers Todd, Allen, Evans, Nadeau, and Bonds at Committee of the Whole
+ − Votes (2)
November 10, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Absent
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
October 20, 2020: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes