+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 15, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0056 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 5956, Expires on Aug 6, 2015
On May 8, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0056, Expires on Aug 6, 2015
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0056, Expires on Aug 6, 2015
- Returned from Mayor
On April 24, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2015
On April 14, 2015 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
- Retained by the Council
On March 16, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0138 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor